Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Smith, Young, Zucker, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the civil penalty to require up to $500 for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights; and requiring the Montgomery County Department of Police to submit a specified report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018, relating to the use of school bus monitoring cameras in Montgomery County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863125/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-12)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Norman and Smith)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Norman and Smith)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Folden and Wivell)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Folden and Wivell)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {263920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {263920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-8)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {778678/1 Adopted 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Floor Amendment {863125/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {480115/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (123-12) 63
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Norman and Smith) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Norman and Smith) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Recede 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Folden and Wivell) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, Folden and Wivell) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {263920/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Conference Committee Report {263920/1 Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (127-8) 70
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-706, 21-706.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM