Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor Dock
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Somerset County to sell the Small Boat Harbor Dock to the City of Crisfield at private sale under specified terms; requiring the Small Boat Harbor Dock to revert to the County Commissioners under specified circumstances; and exempting the sale of the Small Boat Harbor Dock from specified requirements.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0466
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 28
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM