Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley, Colburn, Edwards, Getty, Glassman, Jennings, King, Kittleman, Mathias, Miller, Reilly, Robey, Shank, Simonaire, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2017; and altering a specified limit on the amount of the Maryland estate tax.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0188
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0252 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/14/2014 Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM