Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational License Donation Program - Grants to Eligible Sponsor Organizations and Program Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Recreational License Donation Fund to be used for grants to certain eligible sponsor organizations that provide recreational hunting or fishing opportunities for Gold Star recipients or certain disabled persons; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to make grants to eligible sponsor organizations; specifying the purposes for which a grant may be used; extending the termination provision applicable to the Recreational License Donation Program to June 30, 2022; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Recreational License Donation Program - Grants to Eligible Sponsor Organizations and Program Extension
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM