Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from retaliating against a juror or an officer of the court for any reason relating to the performance of official duties in a pending or completed case in a State or federal court; prohibiting a person from soliciting another to retaliate against a juror or an officer of the court for any reason relating to the performance of official duties in a pending or completed case in a State or federal court; applying specified penalties to a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0098
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672519/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary 23
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {672519/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM