Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law govern the nomination and election of judges of the orphans' court in Baltimore County; authorizing a candidate for judge of the orphans' court in Baltimore County to file and appear on primary election ballots; requiring that the three candidates of each principal political party receiving the largest number of votes in the primary election appear on the general election ballot; prohibiting the political affiliation of candidates from being included on the general election ballot; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0087
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0151 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Ways and Means 46
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 8-901 through 8-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM