Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a handgun permit to a person who is otherwise qualified, has the consent of a bona fide church or religious organization to carry a handgun on the property of the church or religious organization during services and gatherings, and has the intent to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for purposes related to self-protection or the protection of others while on the property of the church or religious organization; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-306, 5-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM