Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the House - Special Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each room accessible for individuals with disabilities in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of at least a certain height, beginning December 31, 2021; requiring 25% by December 31, 2021, 50% by December 31, 2022, 75% by December 31, 2023, and 100% beginning December 31, 2024 of accessible rooms in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of a certain height; and defining the term "accessible room" as one that is in compliance with certain Americans with Disabilities Act guidelines; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0771
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {637075/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-201, 15-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page