Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Brochin, Hough, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing specified subsequent offender penalties for specified offenses that result in the death or life-threatening injury to another as the result of a specified person driving, operating, or controlling a vehicle or vessel; and providing that specified offenses committed in another state or federal jurisdiction are to be considered for the application of specified subsequent offender penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0232 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {848778/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {848778/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-209, 2-210, 2-503 through 2-506, 3-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM