Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Peters, Salling, Simonaire, West, and Benson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding bladder cancer and kidney or renal cell cancer to the types of cancer that are considered occupational diseases suffered in the line of duty and are compensable in a certain manner.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787978/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {787978/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM