Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a common ownership community to foreclose on a lien against a unit owner or lot owner only if the damages secured by the lien consist solely of delinquent periodic or special assessments and reasonable costs and attorney's fees directly related to the filing of the lien and not exceeding the amount of the delinquent assessments and do not include fines or attorney's fees related to recovering the fines; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0286
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428775/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-7)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410213/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senators Muse, Zirkin, and Shank
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Delegates Niemann, Beidle, and Norman
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {428775/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-7) 26
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {410213/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senators Muse, Zirkin, and Shank 62
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Delegates Niemann, Beidle, and Norman 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM