Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Brochin, Cassilly, Lee, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the forfeiture of specified property under specified circumstances; repealing a specified provision authorizing the forfeiture of specified money or weapons relating to possession of a controlled dangerous substance; requiring that a specified seizing authority provide a receipt for property on seizure that includes specified information; requiring that a specified seizing authority mail notice with specified information to the owner of seized property within a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {502316/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {273523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Hough, Muse, and Raskin
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Delegates Vallario, Sydnor, and Moon
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-8)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {478474/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary 43
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {502316/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {273523/1 Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1) 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Hough, Muse, and Raskin 62
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 House Refuses to Recede 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Delegates Vallario, Sydnor, and Moon 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-8) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-104, 12-203, 12-212, 12-304, 12-312, 12-313, 12-405, 12-601, 12-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM