Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of Contracts
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley and Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, without liability for the termination and on 30 days' notice to the contractor, the board of directors of a condominium to terminate a contract entered into by the developer, officers, or previous board of directors within 180 days after the board is elected at a meeting at which the unit owners elect a majority of the board of directors composed of members unaffiliated with the developer; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0183 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218578/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-7)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {218578/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-7) 26
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11B-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM