Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Infrastructure Replacement Projects - Amendment to a Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 120 to 150 the number of days during which the Public Service Commission is required to take a final action after a gas company files an amendment to an approved plan to invest in eligible infrastructure replacement projects.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0075
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127376/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {127376/1 Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 15
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM