Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Lee, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Classifying a certain offense of human trafficking as a crime of violence under certain provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388979/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303, 14-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM