Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Montgomery, Pugh, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State specified seeds, material, and plants that have been treated with a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the seeds, material, and plants bear a label with a specified statement; prohibiting a person from selling in the State, on or after January 1, 2016, a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the person also sells a restricted-use pesticide; prohibiting a person, except specified individuals, from using a neonicotinoid pesticide on or after January 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-2A-01, 5-2A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM