Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Jennings, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a public high school in Baltimore County to adopt a school schedule for that school; requiring the principal of a public high school to convene a school schedule committee to study and recommend a school schedule; providing for the 20-member school schedule committee; providing for the duties of a school schedule committee; requiring the adoption of a school schedule by a vote of two thirds of all faculty members and two-thirds of the votes cast at the parent teacher association meeting; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0123 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM