Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting applicants, agents of applicants, and immediate family members of the applicants and agents from making a payment to a member or the County Executive of Baltimore County or a specified slate during the pendency of the application; prohibiting a member from voting or participating in any way in the proceeding on an application under specified circumstances; requiring the applicant to file a specified affidavit under oath after the application is filed; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-865, 5-866 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM