Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Norman, Peters, Raskin, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the payment of retirement benefits payable from the State Retirement and Pension System to specified constitutional officers who are convicted of or enter a plea of nolo contendere for specified crimes; requiring a specified court to order the forfeiture of specified retirement benefits under specified circumstances; requiring a specified court to order the restoration of specified retirement benefits under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM