Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of this State relating to penalties for violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law; repealing specified redundant provisions; clarifying language; making specified technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; providing for the effect and construction of specified provisions of the Act; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make specified corrections in a specified manner.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 25
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Reassigned to Judiciary 29
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301, 13-402, 13-402.1, 13-616, 13-616.1, 13-616.2, 13-704, 14-102, 14-103, 14-104, 14-107, 14-110, 15-302, 15-311.2, 15-312, 15-313, 15-314, 15-402, 15-411, 15-502, 15-509, 15-515, 16-101, 16-102, 16-113, 16-301, 16-303, 16-303.1, 16-806, 16-807, 16-808, 16-812, 16-813.1, 16-815, 17-107, 17-110, 18-104, 20-102, 20-103, 20-104, 20-105, 20-108, 21-1003, 21-1010, 21-10A-01 through 21-10A-06, 21-10A-07, 21-1116, 21-1122, 21-1124.3, 21-1126, 21-1127, 21-1128, 21-1411, 21-1414, 21-206, 21-401, 21-401.1, 21-402 through 21-404, 21-404.1, 21-405, 21-406, 21-502, 21-706, 21-802.1, 21-803.1, 21-901.1, 21-902, 21-902.1, 21-902.2, 21-902.3, 21-902.4, 21-904, 22-404.4, 22-404.5, 22-405.1, 22-409, 22-415, 22-611, 23-109, 23-305, 23-403, 24-107, 24-111, 24-111.1, 24-112, 24-303, 24-304, 24-401, 25-110, 25-111, 25-112, 25-209, 26-305, 27-101, 27-101 through 27-104, 27-101.1, 27-101.2, 27-102 through 27-107, 27-107.1, 27-108 through 27-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM