Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsored by
Chair, Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Anne Arundel County to enact a local law that authorizes secondary employment of county police officers.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0175
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM