Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Online Application System
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to apply for appointment and commission as a notary public and to renew an existing notary public commission through an online notary public application system; authorizing the Secretary of State to establish and operate an online notary public application system; requiring the Secretary to verify that specified information provided by an applicant is consistent with information on the individual's driver's license or identification card; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-103, 18-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM