Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the limit on the number of Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Planning Grants that may be awarded to a local school system in each year; removing the prohibition against new P-TECH Planning Grants being awarded to establish a new P-TECH school until after the 2016-2017 cohort of P-TECH students completes the 6-year pathway sequence; and repealing certain intent language regarding a prohibition against additional P-TECH schools.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0152
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM