Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0167


CH0101

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to defer to, rather than use information provided by, the insurance regulatory agency of a state or the National Association of Insurance Commissioners committee process in the certification or rating of an assuming insurer under certain circumstances; requiring that certain credit be allowed when certain reinsurance is ceded to certain assuming insurers that have their head offices or are domiciled in and licensed in a reciprocal jurisdiction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {967378/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Economic Matters 33
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:10 PM