Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2018, and in accordance with specified requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve specified plans, including a specified assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of specified architectural paint under specified circumstances beginning July 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0674
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0201 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1701, 9-1702, 9-1707, 9-1733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM