Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Elections - Voting by Mail - Canvass of Votes
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local board of elections to commence the canvass of vote-by-mail ballots cast in a special election conducted by mail at 2 p.m. on the day of the special election; authorizing the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations authorizing a local board to commence the canvass of vote-by-mail ballots before 2 p.m. on the day of the special election; requiring the State Board to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254233/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-33)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {254233/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 33
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (101-33) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302, 9-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM