Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voter Registration - Affiliation With Political Party and Participation in Primary Election, Caucus, or Convention
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that voter registration applications used in the State to register to vote or to change specified information for a registered voter include a specified statement concerning registration with a political party and the voter's right to participate in primary elections, caucuses, or conventions for a political party; authorizing the continued use of specified voter registration applications after June 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0344
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {444137/2 Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {444137/2 Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 33
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
(   3-202, 3-203, 3-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page