Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child, or the District Court at a bail review or preliminary hearing involving a child, to order a specified child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a specified transfer determination except under specified circumstances; requiring the District Court to state the reasons on the record for a finding that detention in a secure juvenile facility would pose a substantial risk of harm to the child or others; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378779/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378779/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-22)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {378779/1 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {378779/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (117-22) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM