Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy Projects
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Middleton, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the limitation that renewable energy projects by commercial property owners financed through a clean energy loan program have an electric generating capacity of not more than 100 kilowatts.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0105
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807075/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {807075/1 Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 18
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM