Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Disposition of Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of License Commissioners to remit a specified administrative fee to the Comptroller instead of using the fee to cover specified expenses; requiring the Board to remit to the Comptroller, rather than to Anne Arundel County, all fees that the Board collects; requiring the Comptroller, from specified fees, to approve and remit to the County amounts necessary to pay specified salaries, benefits and expenses and to remit the balance to the County for the general purposes of the County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604637/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {604637/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Frick) Adopted 64
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 11-1405, 11-1406, 11-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM