Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a contract for the resale of a unit in a condominium by a unit owner other than a developer is not enforceable unless the contract contains a specified notice, and the unit owner furnishes to the purchaser specified information, concerning potential special assessments; and providing that a contract for the resale of a lot in a development subject to the authority of a homeowners association is not enforceable by the vendor unless the purchaser is given a specified notice concerning potential special assessments.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-135, 11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM