Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the diminution in value of specified agricultural land resulting from enactment of the Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 and adoption of specified regulations related to nutrient management; providing for the determination of the amount of the credit; requiring an owner of agricultural land to provide specified information with the owner's tax return in order to claim the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0427 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM