Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Lee, Ready, Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch may not prohibit a dealer from listing on the dealer's website a vehicle for sale or lease at the purchase price or coerce or require a dealer to list a price different from the purchase price on the dealer's website or take an adverse action against a dealer for listing a vehicle at a particular price on the dealer's website; and defining "purchase price" as the full delivered price of a vehicle, excluding taxes, title fees, and certain other dealer charges.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0212
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0526 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {698673/1
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {698673/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {698673/1 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted 25
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {698673/1 26
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 26
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 26
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 27
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Smith) Adopted 29
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Economic Matters 31
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 9:57 AM