Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for the responsible member of an entity providing architectural services; authorizing the State Board of Architects to deny a firm permit to an applicant, reprimand a permit holder, suspend or revoke a permit, or impose a specified penalty under specified circumstances and subject to specified hearing provisions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {564036/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 35
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-402, 15-402.1, 15-403, 15-406, 15-407 through 15-414, 3-401, 3-403, 3-404, 3-410 through 3-416, 3-602, 9-401, 9-402, 9-403, 9-404, 9-405, 9-409, 9-409 through 9-416, 9-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM