Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {869635/1 Adopted 17
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Text - Third - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 19
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Referred Ways and Means 20
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM