Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain agencies to place distracted driver monitoring systems on certain highways under certain circumstances; requiring that a recorded image made by a distracted driver monitoring system include two or more photographs, microphotographs, or electronic images, videotape, or any other medium as well as clear identification of the registration plate number; providing that the owner or driver of a motor vehicle recorded committing a certain violation is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $500; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page