Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - State Chemist Fund
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified special funds in the Department of Agriculture; establishing the State Chemist Fund in the Department as a special, nonlapsing fund; providing for the contents of the Fund; requiring specified penalties and proceeds to be deposited in the State Chemist Fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; providing that money in the Fund, up to $375,000, may not revert to the General Fund of the State; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 28
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-103, 5-107.1, 5-111, 6-103, 6-204, 6-303, 6-310, 6-401, 6-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM