Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, King, and Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax equal to 50% of the renovation costs incurred during the taxable year to provide accessibility and visitability features to an existing home; providing that the credit may not exceed $5,000; requiring applicants to file a specified application and an amended return; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the credit which may not exceed $1,000,000 in a calendar year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0644
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0819 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {179732/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {655969/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text - Chapter - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM