Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the purpose for which licensed funeral establishments and holders of certain permits are authorized to transfer unclaimed cremains of a veteran or an eligible dependent to a veterans service organization under certain circumstances is for the appropriate disposition of the cremains; requiring a funeral establishment or crematory to transfer certain cremains to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the purpose of the appropriate disposition of the cremains; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0604
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0084 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2020
Legislative Date
8/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2020 8/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page