Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Benson, Conway, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements relating to carbon monoxide alarms as the requirements apply to rental dwelling units; requiring specified rental dwelling units, on or after April 1, 2018, to have a carbon monoxide alarm installed within the dwelling outside each separate sleeping area in the immediate vicinity of the bedrooms, and on every level of the rental dwelling unit, including basements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0849
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314031/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {320112/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-3)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Waugh, Kagan, and Salling
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Delegates Holmes, Anderton, and McCray
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {314031/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 33
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {320112/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-3) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Waugh, Kagan, and Salling 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Refuses to Recede 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Delegates Holmes, Anderton, and McCray 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-801 )
(   12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1103, 12-1104, 12-1105, 12-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM