Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Eckardt, and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified expenses if the individual harvests an antlerless deer and donates the deer meat to a venison donation program administered by a certain organization; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the tax credit, including the number of deer donated and the total cost of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, but before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149832/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {149832/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM