Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators King, Conway, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and McFadden
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the county boards of education receive a specified grant to reflect regional differences in the cost of education that are due to factors outside of the control of the local jurisdiction; repealing a provision that allowed for the reduction of a grant under specified circumstances; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599638/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599638/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {703928/1
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (49-89)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {833324/1 Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {533628/1 Rejected (50-89)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-51)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {599638/1 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {599638/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 70
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 71
House 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 71
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {703928/1 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (49-89) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {833324/1 Rejected (48-91) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (48-91) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {533628/1 Rejected (50-89) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (88-51) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM