Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to require each electric company to procure or provide specified energy efficiency and conservation programs and services to its electricity customers on a specified savings trajectory for the duration of the 2018-2020 and 2021-2023 program cycles; establishing a baseline for the savings trajectory; requiring that specified nonenergy benefits be quantifiable and directly related to a specified program or service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377075/1
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Benson) Withdrawn
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 33
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Benson) Withdrawn 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33) 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 36
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 38
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 56
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Text - Chapter - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM