Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the determination of the number of exemptions that an individual may use to calculate a certain deduction under the Maryland income tax; requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, in consultation with the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group, to review and update a certain report relating to certain federal tax changes and to include certain information in the updated report; requiring the Bureau to submit the updated report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2018; and applying the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {513129/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (47-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Favorable 17
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Ready) Adopted 17
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 18
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Floor Amendment {513129/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (47-0) 18
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Text - Third - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 20
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Referred Ways and Means 21
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {695765/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM