Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Good Shepherd Center Cooling Tower
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $450,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the House of the Good Shepherd, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Good Shepherd Center, including the cooling tower, located in Baltimore County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; prohibiting the use of the loan proceeds or matching fund for sectarian religious purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM