Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain forensic genetic genealogical DNA analysis and search may not be initiated without certifying certain information before a court and obtaining a certain authorization from the court; prohibiting certain biological samples subjected to certain forensic genetic genealogical profile analysis to be used to determine certain information about a certain donor; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to produce a certain annual report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0240
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
(   17-101 through 17-105 )
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:47 PM
Click to return on the top page