Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Special Secretary of Minority Affairs, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation and the Attorney General, to establish guidelines for units of State government to consider when determining the appropriate minority business enterprise participation percentage goal for specified procurements; altering the termination date for specified provisions of law concerning the minority business enterprise program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1353
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576486/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {694939/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 28
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {576486/1 Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 14-302, 14-303, 14-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM