Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Election of Governing Body
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the unit owners of a condominium to call a certain meeting to elect a board of directors if the condominium regime was established at least 10 years before the date of the meeting, under certain circumstances; authorizing the lot owners of a homeowners association to call a certain meeting to elect a governing body if the homeowners association declaration was initially recorded at least 10 years before the meeting, under certain circumstances; and applying the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Election of Governing Body
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Election of Governing Body
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11B-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM