Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0190 - 2015RS
   CH0003 - 2016RS
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Eckardt, Guzzone, King, Manno, and McFadden
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the definition of "taxable price" for the State sales and use tax as it applies to the sale or use of an accommodation facilitated by an accommodations intermediary; altering the definition of "vendor" under the State sales and use tax to include an accommodations intermediary; defining specified terms; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1065
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509532/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/1 Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-56)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2015
Legislative Date
5/22/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (30-16)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (89-52)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {509532/1 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hough) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/1 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/1 Rejected (15-29) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (84-56) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 1/20/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (30-16)
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (89-52)
Post Passage 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM