Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - International Election Observers
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a list of registered voters be provided to an international election observer on receipt of certain documentation; requiring an election judge to protect an international election observer's rights; requiring an election judge to allow an international election observer to have access to the voting room; authorizing a local board to determine where an international election observer may be present and assign an international election observer to a particular polling place, as appropriate; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - International Election Observers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914939/1
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914939/1
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (26-18)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - International Election Observers
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {914939/1 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {914939/1 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (26-18) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Floor Amendment {573028/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Floor Amendment {233822/1 (Senator Kagan) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-303, 10-304, 10-308, 10-309, 10-311.1, 1-101, 11-301, 3-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page